Pernardo V Galang v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Pernardo V Galang
Defendant: WellsFargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03468
Filed: June 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 43 Stipulation Regarding Dismissal with Prejudice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
April 19, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 41 Stipulation Extending Time for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 3, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 15 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
September 28, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 29 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
July 13, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/13/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pernardo V Galang v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WellsFargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pernardo V Galang
Represented By: Arasto Farsad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?