Gianni Versace, S.p.A. et al v. Versace 19.69 Abbigliamento Sportivo SRL et al
Plaintiff: Gianni Versace, S.p.A. and Versace USA, Inc.
Defendant: Versace 19.69 Abbigliamento Sportivo SRL, Theofanis Papadas, V1969 Versace SMO LLC, V1969 Versace HG LLC and V1969 USA LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv03617
Filed: June 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 STIPULATED JUDGMENT Re Docket No. 296 . ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/15/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER REGARDING 294 JOINT NOTICE. Motions due by 4/23/2019.Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/3/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 291 Stipulation Setting a Case Schedule. Motions due by 4/9/2019; Responses due by 4/16/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2019 03:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Jury Selection / Jury Trial set for 5/13/2019 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 272 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 280 Stipulation Continuing Trial Date. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/2/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING ( 211 , 220 , 239 , 247 and 251 ) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 266 Stipulation REGARDING PROCESS FOR RESOLUTION OF PROVISIONS OFPERMANENT INJUNCTION AND REVISED TRIAL DATE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 221 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS 218 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2018. Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 250 Stipulation MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 213 Stipulation Modifying Case Schedule. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 208 Stipulation TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS FOR PLAINTIFFS' SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING 192 SEPTEMBER 27, 2017 JOINT LETTER BRIEF.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 09/28/2017. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 186 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Dunnegan, William. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 173 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Dunne, Gerard. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER STRIKING LICENSEE DEFENDANTS 162 ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/17/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER GRANTING 115 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR LICENSEE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/14/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 154 Motion to Appear by Telephone at hearing on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Eran Brosh shall contact Courtcall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements to appear by telephone at the Motion to Withdraw. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 117 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (terminating docket no. 111 ): Amended Pleadings due by 5/8/2017; Close of Fact Discovery due by 8/30/2017; Opening Reports due by 9/26/2017; Rebuttal Reports due by 10/11/2017; Close of E xpert Discovery due by 10/26/2017; Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2018 03:00 PM; Jury Selection /Jury Trial (10-day) set for 3/26/2018 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 93 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact Courtcall at (888) 882-6878 to make arrangements to appear by telephone at the Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 91 Stipulation Setting Case Schedule. Case Management Statement due by 2/16/2017; Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2017 02:00 PM.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 83 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Peter Wayne Ross and Keith Joseph Wesley terminated. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 1/4/2017. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/28/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DIRECTING LVBHQ DEFENDANTS TO APPEAR AND ADDRESS ISSUES RAISED IN 61 MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/9/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 62 Stipulation SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS AND RELATED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Gilliam S. Haywood, Jr. Granting 55 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule for Motions and Related Expedited Discovery. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 47 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Karambelas, N. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/13/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gianni Versace, S.p.A. et al v. Versace 19.69 Abbigliamento Sportivo SRL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gianni Versace, S.p.A.
Represented By: Caroline McKay Cunningham
Represented By: Malcolm A. Heinicke
Represented By: Rosemarie Theresa Ring, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Versace USA, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline McKay Cunningham
Represented By: Malcolm A. Heinicke
Represented By: Rosemarie Theresa Ring, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Versace 19.69 Abbigliamento Sportivo SRL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theofanis Papadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V1969 Versace SMO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V1969 Versace HG LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V1969 USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?