Koenig v. Lavasseur, et al

Plaintiff: Bernard Marko Koenig
Defendant: Ryan Wright, Randolph Lavasseur and Anthony Henner
Case Number: 3:2016cv03621
Filed: June 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
February 7, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/5/2017 at 2:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 3/22/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 7, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
December 5, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/8/2017 at 2:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 1/30/2017. Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 5, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koenig v. Lavasseur, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Marko Koenig
Represented By: William Morris Simpich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph Lavasseur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Henner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?