Galindo et al v. City of San Mateo et al
Plaintiff: Jose Galindo and Sandra Hernandez
Defendant: City of San Mateo, Faysal Abi-Chahine and Derrick Jarvis
Case Number: 3:2016cv03651
Filed: June 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 78 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER [FRCP 41(a)(1)] filed by Sandra Hernandez. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/26/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 72 JOINT STIPULATION AND [Proposed] ORDER TO CONTINUE DECEMBER 21, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Sandra Hernandez. Status reset for 2/1/2018 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/19/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 JOINT STIPULATION AND [Proposed] ORDER TO CONTINUE NOVEMBER 16, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Sandra Hernandez. Status Report due by 12/14/2017. Status Conference set for 12/21/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/7/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 DISMISSING PLAINTIFF JOSE GALINDO'S CLAIMS AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS WITH PREJUDICE filed by City of San Mateo, Faysal Abi-Chahine, Derrick Jarvis. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/1/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION filed by City of San Mateo, Faysal Abi-Chahine, Derrick Jarvis. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/10/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen re 47 Joint Discovery Letter Brief; and ORDER referring Discovery. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re 41 , 42 Joint Letters of December 27, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/3/2017. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 11 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 11 MOTION to Dismiss STIPULATION [AND PROPOSED ORDER] TO CONTINUE OCTOBER 27, 2016 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)] filed b y Jose Galindo, Sandra Hernandez, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 11 MOTION to Dismiss STIPULATION [AND PROPOSED ORDER] TO CONTINUE OCTOBER 27, 2016 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS [Fed . R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)], 11 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing reset for 11/3/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/21/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galindo et al v. City of San Mateo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Galindo
Represented By: Panos Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Hernandez
Represented By: Panos Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faysal Abi-Chahine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?