Janice Alden v.Unum Group et al

Plaintiff: Janice Alden
Defendant: Unum Group, Unum Life Insurance Company of America and Commissioner of the California Department of Insurance, The
Case Number: 3:2016cv03683
Filed: June 30, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND by Hon. William Alsup granting 11 Motion to Remand.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
August 10, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, Motions terminated: 14 Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/10/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
August 1, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janice Alden v.Unum Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Alden
Represented By: Jessica M. Cho
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: Michael Bernard Bernacchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Michael Bernard Bernacchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the California Department of Insurance, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?