Tamondong v. Mortgageit, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Nancy Tamondong
Defendant: Mortgageit, Inc., HSBC Bank USA, National Association and Wells Fargo National Association
Case Number: 3:2016cv03722
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/20/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
October 21, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 34 Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 3, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 40 to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 10/13/2016 Continued to 11/17/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/3/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
July 12, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE [#14] to Modify Preliminary Injunction Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/12/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
July 5, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/5/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tamondong v. Mortgageit, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Tamondong
Represented By: Arasto Farsad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgageit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: Brian Gabriel Mendoza Huey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo National Association
Represented By: Brian Gabriel Mendoza Huey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?