C.R. et al v. City of Antioch et al

Plaintiff: C.R., I.R., R.R., J.R. and Debra Moore
Defendant: City of Antioch, Rick Smith, Chris Kidd, Casey Brogden, Thomas Smith and Brian Rose
Case Number: 3:2016cv03742
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Thomas Smith filed by Casey Brogden, Thomas Smith, Rick Smith, Chris Kidd, City of Antioch. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 10, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
September 21, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL DEADLINES by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 42 Ex Parte Application to Extend Pre-trial Deadlines. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Defendant Rose filed by Casey Brogden, Thomas Smith, Rick Smith, Brian Rose, Chris Kidd, City of Antioch. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
January 9, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To CONTINUE THE ADR DEADLINE filed by Casey Brogden, Thomas Smith, Rick Smith, Brian Rose, Chris Kidd, City of Antioch. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 9, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
December 28, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Deadline to Request Leave to Amend to Add Defendants filed by Beverly McIntosh, Debra Moore, I.R., R.R., C.R., J.R. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
November 16, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Stipulated Protective Order filed by Beverly McIntosh, Jasmine Williams, Debra Moore, I.R., R.R., C.R., J.R. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
September 23, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by C.R., I.R., J.R., Debra Moore, R.R. filed by Debra Moore, I.R., R.R., C.R., J.R. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 23, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
August 5, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/5/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.R. et al v. City of Antioch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.R.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Hasani Gray
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.R.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Hasani Gray
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.R.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Hasani Gray
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.R.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Hasani Gray
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Moore
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Hasani Gray
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Antioch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Brogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?