Han et al v. Synergy Homecare Franchising, LLC

Plaintiff: John Han, Alice Lai-Bitker and Veris Eastbay Homecare, Inc.
Defendant: Synergy Homecare Franchising, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv03759
Filed: July 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 4/11/17 case management conference; STATUS REPORT ORDER Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 7/5/2017, and every three months thereafter until the arbitrator issues a decision. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/6/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
February 3, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Plaintiffs' 44 First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complain filed by Alice Lai-Bitker, John Han, Veris Eastbay Homecare, Inc. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/2/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
February 2, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying Plaintiffs' 44 Motion for Leave to File An Amended Complaint as moot. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
January 31, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 47 Stipulation, filed by Alice Lai-Bitker, John Han, Synergy Homecare Franchising, LLC, Veris Eastbay Homecare, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2017 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/31/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
December 20, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 37 Administrative Motion to delay ruling on pending motion to dismiss. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
October 5, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying Plaintiffs' 14 Motion to Remand. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
September 21, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CMC re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference filed by Alice Lai-Bitker, John Han, Synergy Homecare Franchising, LLC, Veris Eastbay Homecare, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/21/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Han et al v. Synergy Homecare Franchising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Han
Represented By: Philip Mark Milestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Lai-Bitker
Represented By: Philip Mark Milestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veris Eastbay Homecare, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Mark Milestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergy Homecare Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Gary Alan Collis
Represented By: Calvin Eugene Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?