Ryan Muehe v. Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ryan Muehe
Defendant: Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03764
Filed: July 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, to Strike Class Allegations filed by Ryan Muehe. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 10, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
December 13, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by Ryan Muehe. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
September 16, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Ryan Muehe filed by Ryan Muehe. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan Muehe v. Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Muehe
Represented By: .L Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Yeremey O. Krivoshey
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?