Sayta v. Martin
Plaintiff: Shaunak Sayta
Defendant: Benny Martin
Case Number: 3:2016cv03775
Filed: July 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Order. In the attached order, the court denies without prejudice 135 , 136 , and 137 the motions to enforce judgment and for civil contempt.(lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler addressing 110 Discovery Letter Brief; addressing 111 Discovery Letter Brief. As set forth in the attached order, the court directs the parties to meet and confer via telephone (or the equivalent) by March 12, 2 019 for no less than four hours. During that meet and confer, they must be prepared to discuss with specificity what documents they have, what documents will be produced, when they will be produced, what documents will be withheld, and why. The same goes true for interrogatory responses. The court reiterates that the parties have an obligation to negotiate in good faith and cooperate in discovery. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler addressing 99 Discovery Letter Brief. As set forth in the attached, the court (1) denies Mr. Martin's request to deem Mr. Sayta's objections to Mr. Martin's discovery requests waived in toto as untim ely, (2) provides guidance with respect to the substance of Mr. Sayta's objections, including that Mr. Sayta must support his objections and must produce a privilege log, and directs the parties to further meet and confer, and (3) denies Mr. Mar tin's request to deem Mr. Cowan's response to the subpoena Mr. Martin claims to have served on him to be untimely. If the parties are unable to resolve their disputes through a further meet and confer, they may submit a further joint letter brief by February 28, 2019. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CORRECTED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. As set forth in the attached order, Mr. Sayta and Mr. Cowan are ordered to show cause (1) why Mr. Cowan should not be deemed to represent Mr. Sayta in this case before this court for all purposes, (2) why Mr. Martin& #039;s document requests and interrogatories to Mr. Sayta should not be deemed to have been properly served on Mr. Sayta via Mr. Cowan, (3) why Mr. Sayta should not be deemed to have waived all objections to Mr. Martin's document requests and in terrogatories by failing to timely serve responses and objections on Mr. Martin, and (4) why Mr. Sayta should not be compelled to produce all documents requested and respond to all interrogatories. Mr. Sayta and Mr. Cowan are each ordered to file swo rn declarations addressing the order to show cause by January 22, 2019, and are further each ordered to personally appear before the court on January 31, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. and show cause.The court vacates the debtor examination set for January 18, 2019, and grants leave for Mr. Martin to request a new examination date once the pending discovery issues have been resolved. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. As set forth in the attached order, Mr. Sayta and Mr. Cowan are ordered to show cause (1) why Mr. Cowan should not be deemed to represent Mr. Sayta in this case before this court for all purposes, (2) why Mr. Martin's doc ument requests and interrogatories to Mr. Sayta should not be deemed to have been properly served on Mr. Sayta via Mr. Cowan, (3) why Mr. Sayta should not be deemed to have waived all objections to Mr. Martin's document requests and interrogator ies by failing to timely serve responses and objections on Mr. Martin, and (4) why Mr. Sayta should not be compelled to produce all documents requested and respond to all interrogatories. Mr. Sayta and Mr. Cowan are each ordered to file sworn declara tions addressing the order to show cause by January 22, 2019, and are further each ordered to personally appear before the court on January 31, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. and show cause.The court vacates the debtor examination set for January 18, 2019, and grants leave for Mr. Martin to request a new examination date once the pending discovery issues have been resolved. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on January 16, 2019. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting in part 58 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Benny Martin.As set forth in the attached order, the court grants Mr. Martin's motion for attorney's fees in part and awards Mr. Martin reasonable attorney's fees of $6,923. (This award is in addition to, and not in lieu of, Mr. Martin's arbitration awards. ECF Nos. 47 , 50 , 66 .) Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on September 26, 2018. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying 52 Motion for Attorney Fees.The court vacates the April 13, 2017 hearing and denies the defendant's motion for attorney's fees. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting motions at ECF Nos. 10 & 11.The court grants Mr. Martin's motion to compel arbitration of Mr. Sayta's claims. The court also confirms the JAMS arbitration award. The court administratively closes the case pending arbitr ation of Mr. Sayta's claims and directs Mr. Martin to file a proposed order and proposed form of judgment. The parties may reopen the case following arbitration. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/7/2016. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sayta v. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaunak Sayta
Represented By: Shaunak Hitesh Sayta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?