Cuzick v. Zodiac U.S. Seat Shells, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Kyle Cuzick
Defendant: Zodiac U.S. Seat Shells, LLC and Zodiac Cabin & Structures Support, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv03793
Filed: July 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 39 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
December 22, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 Stipulated Protective Order for Standard Litigation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 8, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Pre-Certification Discovery due by 5/19/2017; Certification Expert Disclosure due by 5/22/2017; Close of Expert Discovery due by 6/21/2017; Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/8/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
November 23, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 25 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 15, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 11 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
October 18, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 14 Stipulation Granting Dismissal of Zodiac Cabin & Structures Support, LLC. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
September 30, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 12 Stipulation for Continuance of Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
July 14, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/14/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuzick v. Zodiac U.S. Seat Shells, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zodiac U.S. Seat Shells, LLC
Represented By: Caryn F. Horner
Represented By: Greg Stephen Labate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zodiac Cabin & Structures Support, LLC
Represented By: Caryn F. Horner
Represented By: Greg Stephen Labate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Cuzick
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?