Laurie Munning v. The Gap, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Laurie Munning
Defendant: The Gap, Inc., Gap (Apparel) LLC, Gap International Sales, Inc., Banana Republic (Apparel) LLC and Banana Republic LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv03804
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 80 Stipulation Requesting to Appear at CMC via Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
July 25, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Further Case Management Conference to September 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/27/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
June 1, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 60 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 6/1/17.(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 15, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY PHONE AT THE MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION ARGUMENT SCHEDULED FOR MAY 18, 2017 AT 2:00 PM IN COURTROOM 12, 19TH FLOOR TELEPHONICALLY re 66 Letter filed by Laurie Munning. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/15/2017. Counsel for plaintiffs are directed to contact the court clerk for dial-in instructions.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
February 24, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 44 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 2/24/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 22, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion to Strike 53 Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 2/22/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
November 9, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF MORE TIME TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESPOND re 36 Stipulation filed by Laurie Munning. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/8/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
October 28, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson. Amended Complaint due by 11/18/2016.(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 13, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: October 17, 2016 Hearing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/13/16.(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laurie Munning v. The Gap, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gap, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Esther Kyungmin Ro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gap (Apparel) LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Esther Kyungmin Ro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gap International Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Esther Kyungmin Ro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banana Republic (Apparel) LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Esther Kyungmin Ro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banana Republic LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Esther Kyungmin Ro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Munning
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?