Jones et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al

Plaintiff: Kristin Jones and Brian Jones
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pacific Gynecology and Obstetrics Medical Group and Kristen Matsic
Case Number: 3:2016cv03840
Filed: July 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MDL ORDER transferring case to the District of Massachusetts (MDL No. 2657). ***Civil Case Terminated. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
July 19, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/19/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 15, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Claudia Wilken. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/15/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Jones
Represented By: Joseph W. Carcione, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua James Kim Henderson
Represented By: Joshua Seth Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Jones
Represented By: Joseph W. Carcione, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua James Kim Henderson
Represented By: Joshua Seth Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Amir M. Nassihi
Represented By: G. Gregg Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gynecology and Obstetrics Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Matsic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?