Hinchcliff v. St. Joseph Health et al

Plaintiff: Kacie Hinchcliff
Defendant: St. Joseph Health, Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital and Angela Danvers
Case Number: 3:2016cv03892
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 34 Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Complete Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
December 8, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REGARDING ADR PHONE CONFERENCE. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2017; Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/15/2017; Designation of Experts due by 6/29/2017; Rebuttal Reports due by 7/13/2017; Close of Expert Discover y due by 7/27/2017; Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2017 03:00 PM; Jury Selection / Jury Trial (4-day) set for 11/13/2017 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/8/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 2, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/2/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinchcliff v. St. Joseph Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Health
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Fellion
Represented By: Charles L. Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Fellion
Represented By: Charles L. Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Danvers
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Fellion
Represented By: Charles L. Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kacie Hinchcliff
Represented By: Charles David Cochran
Represented By: Amy S. Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?