American General Life Insurance Company v. Hart et al

Plaintiff: American General Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Gayle Hart and David L Lewis
Case Number: 3:2016cv03904
Filed: July 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 60 Stipulation to Remand Case; granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion for Discharge, Attorney Fees, and Injunction. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
January 13, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying 48 Motion for Leave to Move for Reconsideration. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
December 27, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying 37 Motion to Dismiss. The court sets a case-management conference for January 19, 2017 at 11 a.m. The parties must confer and submit a joint statement by January 12. See the order for more detailed instructions. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American General Life Insurance Company v. Hart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Dennis J. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Lewis
Represented By: James A. DiBoise
Represented By: David L. Lansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?