Backus v. Biscomerica Corporation

Plaintiff: Troy Backus
Defendant: Biscomerica Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv03916
Filed: July 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE Re Docket No. 34 : Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2017. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/22/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
March 27, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS 9 MOTION TO DISMISS.Amended Pleadings due by 4/17/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
October 5, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 23 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Backus v. Biscomerica Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biscomerica Corporation
Represented By: Brendan William Brandt
Represented By: Angelica Acosta Samaniego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Backus
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Gregory Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?