Caponio v. Boilermakers Local 549 et al

Plaintiff: Teresa Caponio
Defendant: Boilermakers Local 549, Boilermakers Western States Joint Apprenticeship Program and International Brotherhood of Boilermakers
Case Number: 3:2016cv03919
Filed: July 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 47 , 48 , 49 Motions to Dismiss. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
October 19, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 26 STIPULATION. Initial Case Management Conference remains set for 11/22/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/15/2016. Motions due by 11/8/2016. Responses due by 12/6/2016. Replies due by 12/20/2016. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/19/2016. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
September 15, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINES FOR MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING, AS MODIFIED re: 15 MOTION to Dismiss , 12 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2016 10:00 AM in C ourtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 10/13/2016. Replies due by 10/27/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/15/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caponio v. Boilermakers Local 549 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Caponio
Represented By: Bryan Jeffrey Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boilermakers Local 549
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boilermakers Western States Joint Apprenticeship Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Boilermakers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?