Crago v. Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Crago
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., The Charles Schwab Corporation, Charles Schwab and Walter W. Bettinger, II
Case Number: 3:2016cv03938
Filed: July 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 157 FOR EXTENSION OF CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/28/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 155 for Extension of Class Certification Schedule AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2021 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/5/2020. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 149 for Extension of Class Certification Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2021 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/6/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 146 For Extension of Class Certification Schedule AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2021 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/5/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2020 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/13/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg DENYING 102 MOTION TO CERTIFY ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 99 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 12/14/2017 continued to 1/25/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement Due 1/18/2018. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/7/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 86 for Extension of Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/25/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting Defendant's 49 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 44 for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/12/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER 39 TO SET DEADLINE FOR FILING NEW COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/18/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint and to Vacate Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 10/13/2016 continued to 1/5/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/26/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Hon. William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/15/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crago v. Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Crago
Represented By: Adam Christopher McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charles Schwab Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter W. Bettinger, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?