Maria Karla Terraza v. Safeway Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Maria Karla Terraza
Defendant: Safeway Inc. and Benefit Plans Committee Safeway Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03994
Filed: July 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant AON Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and to Continue Hearing Date filed by Maria Karla Terraza. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
March 20, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Safeway Inc., Benefit Plans Committee Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 13, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 46 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
January 18, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER] filed by Safeway Inc., Benefit Plans Committee Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
November 1, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER For Extension of Time to File filed by Maria Karla Terraza. Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 1, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria Karla Terraza v. Safeway Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Karla Terraza
Represented By: Ronald Scott Kravitz
Represented By: Sahag Majarian, II
Represented By: James E. Miller
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: Kolin Tang
Represented By: Nathan Curtis Zipperian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefit Plans Committee Safeway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?