Vista Energy Marketing, LP v. Pacific Gas & Electric Company et al

Plaintiff: Vista Energy Marketing, LP
Defendant: Pacific Gas & Electric Company, Albert Torres, Bill Chen and Tanisha Robinson
Case Number: 3:2016cv04019
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 58 Stipulation Setting Case Schedule: Close of Fact Discovery due by 8/3/2018; Designation of Experts due by 8/31/2018; Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 10/19/2018; Close of Expert Di scovery due by 11/2/2018; Motions due by 12/7/2018; Responses due by 1/4/2019; Replies due by 1/25/2019; Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2019 03:00 PM; Jury Selection /Jury Trial set for 4/29/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
September 8, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., DENYING 26 Motion to Dismiss. (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
August 29, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE STATEMENT. Statement due by 8/31/2017. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/29/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 24, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 20 Stipulation Establishing Briefing Schedule. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vista Energy Marketing, LP v. Pacific Gas & Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vista Energy Marketing, LP
Represented By: Leah E Capritta
Represented By: Thomas Drew Leland
Represented By: Nicholas Brian Melzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gas & Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanisha Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?