Brown v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Diane Yvonne Brown
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2016cv04022
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 24 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; and Remanding to the Commissioner for Further Proceedings. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on October 4, 2017. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
September 29, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 24 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; and Remanding to the Commissioner for Further Proceedings. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
June 20, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 for extension of time for Plaintiff to file optional response brief filed by Diane Yvonne Brown. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/20/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
April 25, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for 11-day extension of time to file Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Diane Yvonne Brown. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/25/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
March 31, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time for plaintiff to file brief in support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Diane Yvonne Brown. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/31/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
January 10, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE MSJ. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/10/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Yvonne Brown
Represented By: Geri Nadine Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?