Men Nguyen v. David Tibbles et al

Plaintiff: Men Nguyen
Defendant: Ocean Angel IV and David Tibbles
Case Number: 3:2016cv04023
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES filed by Men Nguyen. Fact discovery cut-off 4/1/2018. Expert disclosures 4/15/2018. Expert rebuttal 5/2/2018. Expert disco very cut-off 5/30/2018. Deadline to file dispositive motions 6/7/2018. Pretrial conference statement due 8/20/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 9/24/2018 - 10/15/2018 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 6, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding ADR re 36 Stipulation and Order filed by Ocean Angel IV, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 6, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
June 22, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Ocean Angel IV, LLC filed by Ocean Angel IV, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 22, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Men Nguyen v. David Tibbles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Men Nguyen
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Angel IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Tibbles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?