West et al v. All Aboard America Bus et al

Plaintiff: Michael West, Cherilyn Donato and Elizabeth Ortiz
Defendant: All Aboard America! Holdings, Inc., All Aboard America Bus, All Aboard, Inc and All Aboard America Holding, Inc
Case Number: 3:2016cv04071
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/4/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
February 17, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/27/2017. Close of Expert Discovery due by 10/30/2017. Designation of Experts due by 9/18/2017. Discovery due by 10/10/2017. Motions due by 11/30/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/7 /2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 8/31/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 4/16/2018 08 :30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Further Jury Trial set for 4/17/2018, 4/18/2018, 4/19/2018, 4/20/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Judge Jacqueline S. Corley on 2/17/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 1, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 24 Motion to Dismiss. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West et al v. All Aboard America Bus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Aboard America! Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Ying-Yen Chin
Represented By: Mark F. Hazelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Aboard America Bus
Represented By: Kimberly Ying-Yen Chin
Represented By: Mark F. Hazelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Aboard, Inc
Represented By: Kimberly Ying-Yen Chin
Represented By: Mark F. Hazelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Aboard America Holding, Inc
Represented By: Kimberly Ying-Yen Chin
Represented By: Mark F. Hazelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael West
Represented By: Nikolaus W Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherilyn Donato
Represented By: Nikolaus W Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ortiz
Represented By: Nikolaus W Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?