Hydros Bottle LLC v. Stephen Gould Corporation

Plaintiff: Hydros Bottle LLC
Defendant: Stephen Gould Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv04077
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT TO ADD PREJUDGMENT INTEREST by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion to Amend/Correct. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
May 11, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 51 MOTION to Amend/Correct, 52 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Hydros Bottle LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
April 17, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Hydros's Time to File Motion for Attorney's Fees) filed by Hydros Bottle LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 17, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
December 13, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Hydros Bottle LLC filed by Hydros Bottle LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
October 21, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Stephen Gould Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 3, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Stephen Gould Corporation. Case Management Statement due by 12/14/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hydros Bottle LLC v. Stephen Gould Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Gould Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hydros Bottle LLC
Represented By: Alan P. Block
Represented By: Thomas B Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?