Smith v. Constellation Brands, Inc.

Plaintiff: Julia Smith
Defendant: Constellation Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv04101
Filed: July 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defendant Constellation Brands, Inc., and against plaintiff Julia Smith. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/19/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 3, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/3/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
November 9, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/8/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
November 8, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup granting 20 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
September 28, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Case Management Statement due by 12/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/28/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 21, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY DANIEL RAY BACON TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney..(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
September 2, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting 6 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Constellation Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constellation Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Traci L Bernard-Marks
Represented By: Marjorie Fochtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Smith
Represented By: Daniel Ray Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?