Palomino v. Facebook, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jose Palomino
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv04230
Filed: July 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 22 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
October 27, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 26 Stipulation Changing Time To Respond re 22 MOTION to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
September 22, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Gary F. Lynch. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
September 1, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Carroll, Katrina. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palomino v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Palomino
Represented By: Todd David Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Benedict Y Hur
Represented By: Justina Kahn Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?