Banga v. Kanios et al
Plaintiff: Navjeet Singh Banga
Defendant: Chris Gus Kanios, Dean Barbieri, Eleanor Armstrong, Debra Bean, John F. Kennedy University and National University
Case Number: 3:2016cv04270
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 305 Discovery Letter Brief Requesting an Independent Medical Examination. Signed on 4/16/2020.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 273 Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to Show Cause. Signed on 4/13/2020. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 271 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 276 Administrative Motion ; granting 295 Administrative Motion ; granting 299 Motion to Amend/Correct ; denying 306 Administrative Motion. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on Discovery Letter Briefs 253 , 254 . Signed on 12/19/2019. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 210 of scheduling order dates AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Jury Selection/Trial set for 5/26/2020 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/26/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion to Dismiss. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 12/29/17 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banga v. Kanios et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navjeet Singh Banga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Gus Kanios
Represented By: Francis Lawrence Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Barbieri
Represented By: Francis Lawrence Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleanor Armstrong
Represented By: Francis Lawrence Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Bean
Represented By: Francis Lawrence Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Kennedy University
Represented By: Francis Lawrence Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National University
Represented By: Francis Lawrence Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?