Tamalpais Union High School District v. W.

Plaintiff: Tamalpais Union High School District
Defendant: D. W.
Case Number: 3:2016cv04350
Filed: August 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING ( 43 , 44 ) CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND AFFIRMING ALJS DECISION IN ITS ENTIRETY. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
January 17, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 40 Stipulation to Continue Hearing. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
November 18, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 37 Stipulation TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Cross Motions due by 1/23/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
October 19, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 32 Stipulation Re Briefing Schedule for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 6, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 26 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 5, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 25 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 4, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 12 MOTION TO TEMPORARILY STAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
October 3, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 22 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
August 31, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 10 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tamalpais Union High School District v. W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamalpais Union High School District
Represented By: David Reis Mishook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. W.
Represented By: Susan Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?