Ron Alul et al v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ron Alul, Mark Gerstle, William Kenar, Yun-Fei Lou, Arpan Srivastava and Melissa Yeung
Defendant: American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv04384
Filed: August 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER REGARDING AMENDED SCHEDULE FOR EXPERT DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING RELATED TOPLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar. Rebuttal Reports due by 10/25/2019. Reply Report due by 11/15/2019. Motions due by 2/7/2020. Responses due by 3/13/2020. Replies due by 4/10/2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 184 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Selecting Private ADR by Jeff Aberin, Lindsey Aberin, Don Awtrey, Charles Burgess, John Kelly, Yun-Fei Lou, Joy Matza, Melissa Yeung filed by Lindsey Aberin, John Kelly, Melissa Yeung, Yun-Fei Lou, Charles Burgess, Joy Matza, Jeff Aberin, Don Awtrey. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 29, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 179 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR AMENDED SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL EVENTS THROUGH BRIEFING RELATED TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Lindsey Aberin, John Kelly, Melissa Yeung, Yun-Fei Lo u, Charles Burgess, Joy Matza, Jeff Aberin, Don Awtrey. Last Day to Serve Written Discovery 3/15/2019. Close of Fact Discovery 5/31/2019. Opening Expert Reports Due 6/14/2019. Rebuttal Reports Due 9/13/2019. Close of Expert Discovery 10/4/2019. Motion for Class Certification 10/25/2019. Responses due by 12/6/2019. Replies due by 1/10/2020. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 28, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 175 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Permitting Counsel to Appear Telephonically at the December 5, 2018 Status Conference filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 29, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 167 STIPULATI ON AND ORDER FOR SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL EVENTS THROUGH BRIEFING RELATED TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Lindsey Aberin, John Kelly, Melissa Yeung, Yun-Fei Lou, Charles Burg ess, Joy Matza, Jeff Aberin, Don Awtrey. Close of Fact Discovery due by 2/28/2019. Close of Expert Discovery due by 4/29/2019. Motions due by 5/29/2019. Responses due by 7/15/2019. Replies due by 8/14/2019. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 2, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018) Modified on 10/2/2018 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 152 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Permitting Counsel To Appear Telephonically At The July 18. 2018 Status Conference filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 12, 2018. Please email the Courtroom Deputy Clerk (jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov) one number at which all attorneys appearing by telephone can be reached at the time of the conference. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 145 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Time to File and Respond to Third Amended Complaint and Continuing Status Conference filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. Amended Pleadings due by 4/27/2018. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 16, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 142 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PERMITTING AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC'S COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT APRIL 18, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 12, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 137 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Jeff Aberin, Lindsey Aberin, Don Awtrey, Charles Burgess, Daniel Criner, Jared Crooks, John Kelly, Yun-Fei Lou, Joy Matza, Melissa Yeung filed by Melissa Yeung, Yun-Fei Lou, Charles Burgess, Don Awtrey, John Kelly, Lindsey Aberin, Daniel Criner, Jared Crooks, Joy Matza, Jeff Aberin. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 2, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS, AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 116 Motion for Sanctions. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Increasing The Page Limit Of America Honda Motor Co., Inc.'s Reply In Support Of Motion To Dismiss By Two Pages filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 26, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 110 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation Regarding Scheduling Submitted Pursuant to August 24, 2017, Order (D.E. 107) filed by Ron Alul, Melissa Yeung, Donald Tran, Yun-Fei Lou, Mark Gerstle , Charles Burgess, Don Awtrey, John Kelly, Lindsey Aberin, Daniel Criner, Jared Crooks, Joy Matza, Jordan Moss, Jeff Aberin Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF AN INTERIM CO-LEAD CLASS COUNSEL AND DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF AN EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 93 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR filed by Melissa Yeung, Donald Tran, Arpan Srivastava, Yun-Fei Lou, Mark Gerstle, Don Awtrey, John Kelly, Lindsey Aberin, Daniel Criner, Jordan Moss. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 28, 2017. This order amends and supersedes the order issued April 25, 2017. ECF No. 81. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Dismiss; denying 65 Motion for Leave to File. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 76 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 4, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION filed by Melissa Yeung, Donald Tran, Arpan Srivastava, Yun-Fei Lou, Mark Gerstle, Charles Burgess, Don Awtrey, John Kelly, Lindsey Aberin, Daniel Criner, Rebecca Gray, Jordan Moss. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 3, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 30 Motion to Transfer Case. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 18, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING THE CONSOLIDATION OF THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE AND DATE OF HEARING ON AMERICAN HONDA COMPANY, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE filed by Ron Alul, Melissa Yeung, William Kenar, Arpan Srivastava, Yun-Fei Lou, Mark Gerstle. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 17, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Seeking Leave For Plaintiffs To File An Amended Complaint And For An Order Changing Time Pursuant To L.R. 6-3 (Joint Stipulation) filed by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/5/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ron Alul et al v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Alul
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Catherine Gannon
Represented By: Scott Alan George
Represented By: Daniel R. Leathers
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Roland K. Tellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Gerstle
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Catherine Gannon
Represented By: Scott Alan George
Represented By: Daniel R. Leathers
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Roland K. Tellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kenar
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Catherine Gannon
Represented By: Scott Alan George
Represented By: Daniel R. Leathers
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Roland K. Tellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yun-Fei Lou
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Catherine Gannon
Represented By: Scott Alan George
Represented By: Daniel R. Leathers
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Roland K. Tellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arpan Srivastava
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Catherine Gannon
Represented By: Scott Alan George
Represented By: Daniel R. Leathers
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Roland K. Tellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Yeung
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Catherine Gannon
Represented By: Scott Alan George
Represented By: Daniel R. Leathers
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Roland K. Tellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Christian Andolina
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia M. Kiser
Represented By: Eric B. Scwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?