Notter v. City of Pleasant Hill et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Notter
Defendant: City of Pleasant Hill, Pleasant Hill Police Department and Chelsea Wright
Case Number: 3:2016cv04412
Filed: August 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 56 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
November 14, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER.Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 8/7/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 8/7/2017 to 8/11/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/14/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 2, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Complaint due by 11/15/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Notter v. City of Pleasant Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Notter
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Witteman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pleasant Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleasant Hill Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?