Gray v. Apple, Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: TERELL GRAY
Defendant: Apple Incorporated, APPLE STORE, KELLEY DORGAN, GREG HOPSON, City of Berkeley, Berkeley Police Department, TIMOTHY KAPLAN, ABC PARTNERSHIP, XYZ Corporation, JANE DOE and John Doe
Movant: Target
Case Number: 3:2016cv04421
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/19/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 5, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 6/15/2017. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/15/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
May 3, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND GRANTING 64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2017. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/3/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
March 7, 2017 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 3/14/2017. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/7/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
December 15, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requesting Reassignment. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/15/16.(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
October 18, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 66 Stipulated Administrative Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson.(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
August 23, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
August 3, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/3/2016. (seb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Apple, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERELL GRAY
Represented By: JAVONNA C. BAKER
Represented By: TRACEY S. COSBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Incorporated
Represented By: Jean-Paul P. Cart
Represented By: Eliot Steven Jubelirer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE STORE
Represented By: Jean-Paul P. Cart
Represented By: Eliot Steven Jubelirer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLEY DORGAN
Represented By: Jean-Paul P. Cart
Represented By: Eliot Steven Jubelirer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG HOPSON
Represented By: Jean-Paul P. Cart
Represented By: Eliot Steven Jubelirer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Berkeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkeley Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Target
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER EUGENE MCINTYRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?