Iudicium Solutions, Ltd. v. Curzon Investments USA, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Iudicium Solutions, Ltd.
Defendant: Curzon Investments USA, LLC, Curzon Petroleum and Energy Corporation, Christopher Curzon Bearman and Josephine Curzon Bearman
Case Number: 3:2016cv04682
Filed: August 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFTER HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/28/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 16, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 14 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/16/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 2, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/2/2016. Show Cause Response due by 12/15/2016. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/22/2016 11:00 AM. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
October 28, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 10 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iudicium Solutions, Ltd. v. Curzon Investments USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iudicium Solutions, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael Craig Abel
Represented By: Scott H. McNutt
Represented By: Thomas Bogdan Rupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curzon Investments USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curzon Petroleum and Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Curzon Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josephine Curzon Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?