Steinebach et al v. Crane Co. et al

Plaintiff: William Steinebach and Glenda Steinebach
Defendant: Crane Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc., Plant Products & Supply Company, Hill Brothers Chemical Company and Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.,
Case Number: 3:2016cv04687
Filed: August 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2017 101 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ANY ASBESTOS EXPOSURE CLAIMS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 FROM DEFENDANT PUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER, INC. (FKA TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION) filed by William Steinebach, Glenda Steinebach. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
November 30, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/28/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
September 19, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 18 Insurers' Motion to Intervene. Complaint in intervention due by 09/23/16. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinebach et al v. Crane Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Steinebach
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Steinebach
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Peter Edward Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Lisa Marie Petrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Burnam Ebrahimi
Represented By: Patrick J. Glinka
Represented By: Sandra Lucia Gryder
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plant Products & Supply Company
Represented By: Carol L. Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.,
Represented By: Erica Lynn Morris
Represented By: Demian David Steele
Represented By: George D. Yaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?