Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd. v. Swagway, LLC

Plaintiff: Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Swagway, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv04804
Filed: August 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANT'S 15 MOTION TO TRANSFER. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2017)
November 16, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 49 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Initial Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 10, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gerald F. Ivey. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 7, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Irene H. Chen. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
September 27, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth D. Ferrill. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 22, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to of Quingu Yin. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
September 15, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Luke J. McCammon. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
September 13, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Stipulation to Amend Briefing Schedule. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd. v. Swagway, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kelly Chieh Lu
Represented By: Luke Joseph McCammon
Represented By: Robert Francis McCauley
Represented By: Jacob Adam Schroeder
Represented By: Qingyu Yin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swagway, LLC
Represented By: Lei Mei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?