Behrendt v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert Behrendt
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. and Permanente Physicians Retirement Plan for Hawaii Permanente Medical Group
Case Number: 3:2016cv04825
Filed: August 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
February 13, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL Re Docket No. 29 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/13/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
December 20, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 27 Stipulation Dismissing Defendant Permanente Physicians Retirement Plan for Hawaii Permanente Medical Group. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
November 10, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Behrendt v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Permanente Physicians Retirement Plan for Hawaii Permanente Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Behrendt
Represented By: Joshua Michael Heinlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?