Jason Parker v. Hey, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Jason Parker
Defendant: Hey, Inc. and Twitter, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv04884
Filed: August 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 52 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/9/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
November 21, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 38 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY EVE-LYNN RAPP PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016) Modified on 11/21/2016 (whalc2, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 33 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ALEXANDER G. TIEVSKY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
October 7, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/7/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
October 5, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 23 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 1, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 20 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR EXTENDED BRIEFING SCHEDULE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jason Parker v. Hey, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Parker
Represented By: Stewart Ryan Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hey, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Karen Lynn Burhans
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Kyle Christopher Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?