Osprey Partners RSF LLC et al v. UBS Financial Services Inc.

Plaintiff: Osprey Partners RSF LLC and Svoboda Consulting
Defendant: UBS Financial Services Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv04894
Filed: August 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 12:1725
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL (pursuant to 29 stipulation) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
January 17, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER (pursuant to 27 stipulation) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
November 14, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 19 STIPULATION SELECTING PRIVATE ADR by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 7, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/7/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osprey Partners RSF LLC et al v. UBS Financial Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osprey Partners RSF LLC
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Represented By: Scott M Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Svoboda Consulting
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Represented By: Scott M Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Financial Services Inc.
Represented By: Alexander James Bukac
Represented By: Julie L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?