Prasad v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage

Plaintiff: Sunil Prasad
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 3:2016cv04941
Filed: August 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 Stipulation filed by Sunil Prasad, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/9/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
December 16, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL; ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING AND STATUS REPORT DEADLINE. Show Cause Response due by 12/22/2016. Compliance hearing set Friday, 1/27/17at 9:01AM. Joint Statement filed 1/20/17. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/16/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
November 29, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO FILE TIMELY CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; VACATING DECEMBER 2, 2016 COMPLIANCE HEARING. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/12/2016 02:01 PM. Show Cause Respo nse due by 12/2/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2016 is CONTINUED to 12/12/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. The Compliance hearing set for 12/2/2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/29/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 10, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RECALLING AND VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE STATUS RE: ADR EFFORTS AND SETTING COMPLIANCE DATE re 20 Order to Show Cause. Compliance hearing set for Friday, 12/2/2016 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/10/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
October 28, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR ADR. Show Cause Response due by 11/4/2016. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/28/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prasad v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunil Prasad
Represented By: Erikson McDonnell Davis
Represented By: Tala Rezai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Viddell Lee Heard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?