Krommenhock et al v. Post Foods, LLC

Plaintiff: Debbie Krommenhock and Stephen Hadley
Defendant: Post Foods, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv04958
Filed: August 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON 44 MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
April 17, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference granting 74 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference continued to 5/23/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/17/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
March 22, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/22/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
February 15, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Joint Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2017. Case Management Conference continued to 3/7/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/15/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
November 16, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE granting 38 STIPULATION. Response due by 1/13/2017. Reply due by 1/27/2017. Motion Hearing continued to 2/15/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/16/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krommenhock et al v. Post Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Krommenhock
Represented By: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: Trevor Matthew Flynn
Represented By: Melanie Rae Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Hadley
Represented By: Jack Fitzgerald
Represented By: Trevor Matthew Flynn
Represented By: Melanie Rae Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Post Foods, LLC
Represented By: Angel A. Garganta
Represented By: Cody Scott Lonning
Represented By: Robert Leslie Meyerhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?