Davis v. Lefcourt

Plaintiff: John Limbird Davis
Defendant: V. Roy Lefcourt
Case Number: 3:2016cv04980
Filed: August 30, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Referring Judge: PSLC AGB
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVOKING PLAINTIFFS IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND DENYING MOTION TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge James Donato denying 15 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017) Modified on 3/27/2017 (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 12 Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; denying 12 Motion for Discovery; denying 13 Motion to Amend/Correct ;. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
January 17, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/17/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
November 16, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge James Donato denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Limbird Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Roy Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?