Caracal Enterprises LLC et al v. Robert Suranyi et al

Plaintiff: Caracal Enterprises LLC and Caracal Consulting Inc.
Defendant: Robert Suranyi, Robert Suranyi Systems Support, Passport, Inc. and PassportParking, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv05073
Filed: September 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 35 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
February 1, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/1/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
November 30, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 27 (1) EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT PASSPORTPARKING, INC. TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND (2) EXTENDING TIME FOR THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 12/15/2016 Continued to 2/16/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due 2/9/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/30/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caracal Enterprises LLC et al v. Robert Suranyi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caracal Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Marcel F. De Armas
Represented By: Jennifer L. Feldman
Represented By: Brian E. Mitchell
Represented By: Edward Alan Pennington
Represented By: John Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caracal Consulting Inc.
Represented By: Marcel F. De Armas
Represented By: Jennifer L. Feldman
Represented By: Brian E. Mitchell
Represented By: Edward Alan Pennington
Represented By: John Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Suranyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Suranyi Systems Support
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Passport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PassportParking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?