Shwurong Lee v. The Bank of New York Mellon FKA The Bank of New York as Successor Trustee to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee of MASTR Adjustable Rate Mortgages Trust 2004-7 et al

Plaintiff: Shwurong Lee
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon FKA The Bank of New York as Successor Trustee to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee of MASTR Adjustable Rate Mortgages Trust 2004-7, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and MTC Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv05094
Filed: September 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Filing Deadline for Bill of Costs and Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 10, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
March 23, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 56 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Shwurong Lee. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 23, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 10, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 37 Motion to Dismiss; granting 38 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
December 9, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 18 Motion to Dismiss; granting 19 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
September 9, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 8 Motion for TRO. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shwurong Lee v. The Bank of New York Mellon FKA The Bank of New York as Successor Trustee to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee of MASTR Adjustable Rate Mortgages Trust 2004-7 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shwurong Lee
Represented By: Megan Ann Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon FKA The Bank of New York as Successor Trustee to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. as Trustee of MASTR Adjustable Rate Mortgages Trust 2004-7
Represented By: Mariel Alexandria G. Gerlt-Ferraro
Represented By: John M. Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mariel Alexandria G. Gerlt-Ferraro
Represented By: John M. Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Joseph Reynolds
Represented By: Jerett T Yan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?