David Klein v. Medivation, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David Klein
Defendant: Medivation, Inc., David T. Hung, Kathryn E. Blickenstaff, Michael L. King, Patrick Machado, Dawn Svoronos, W. Anthony Vernon, Wendy L. Yarno and Kathryn E. Falberg
Case Number: 3:2016cv05154
Filed: September 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONCERNING PLAINTIFF'S VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S APPLICATION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES by Hon. William Alsup granting 15 Stipulation. Motions due by 11/17/2016.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
September 28, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/28/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 20, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING FILING OF NOTICE OF PUBLICATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/20/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Klein v. Medivation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Klein
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Represented By: Barbara Ann Rohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medivation, Inc.
Represented By: Shawna Virginia Benfield
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David T. Hung
Represented By: Shawna Virginia Benfield
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn E. Blickenstaff
Represented By: Shawna Virginia Benfield
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. King
Represented By: Shawna Virginia Benfield
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Machado
Represented By: Shawna Virginia Benfield
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Svoronos
Represented By: Shawna Virginia Benfield
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Anthony Vernon
Represented By: Shawna Virginia Benfield
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy L. Yarno
Represented By: Shawna Virginia Benfield
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn E. Falberg
Represented By: Shawna Virginia Benfield
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?