Daugherty v. SolarCity Corporation
Plaintiff: Breana Daugherty
Defendant: SolarCity Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv05155
Filed: September 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 64 Stipulation. Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2017 11:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER RE SCHEDULE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATIONMotions terminated: 57 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Clarification Regarding Class Certification Deadline in Scheduling Order filed by Breana Daugherty., ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/13/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Hon. William Alsup granting 46 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/23/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OR STAY AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 36 Motion to Compel. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/18/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/7/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SEEKING RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/2/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William H. Alsup on 3/17/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daugherty v. SolarCity Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breana Daugherty
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolarCity Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?