Grace et al v. Alaska Air Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Grace, Katherine R. Arcell, Keith Dean Bradt, Judy Bray, Jose M. Brito, Jan Marie Brown, Robert D. Conway, Judy Crandall, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda K. Davis, Pamela Faust, Carolyn Fjord, Don Freeland, Donna Fry, Gabriel Garavanian, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Lee M. Gentry, Valarie Ann Jolly, Gail S. Kosach, John Lovell, Michael C. Malaney, Len Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Patricia Ann Meeuwsen, L. West Oehmig, Jr., Cynthia Prosterman, Deborah M. Pulfer, Dana L. Robinson, Robert A. Rosenthal, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra K. Russell, Sylvia N. Sparks, June Stansbury, Clyde D. Stensrud, Wayne Taleff, Gary Talewsky, Annette M. Tippetts, Diana Lynn Ultican, J. Michael Walker, Pamela S. Ward and Michael Farrah
Defendant: Alaska Air Group, Inc. and Alaska Airlines, Inc
Case Number: 3:2016cv05165
Filed: September 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 85 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 7, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM by Hon. William Alsup granting 78 Motion to bring equipment.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 1, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE PRETRIAL FILINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/1/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 29, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND CHANGING TIME OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/29/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 28, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE CLOSING AND REQUEST FOR RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11//28/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 22, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 61 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CLARKE T. EDWARDS PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 18, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/18/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
November 14, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER REQUEST RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/14/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 10, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/10/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 2, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PROPOSED SCHEDULES AND REQUEST FOR RESPONSE by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 29 Stipulation Status Report due by 11/8/2016. Bench Trial set for 12/12/2016 08:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2016 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
October 28, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY GIL D. MESSINA PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 20, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CLOSING MERGER. Signed by Judge a on 10/20/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
October 19, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/19/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 18, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY GIL D. MESSINA by Hon. William Alsup denying 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 17, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/17/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 6, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING SURREPLY AND CONTINUING HEARING, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Order to Show Cause Prohibiting the Acquisition of Virgin America, Inc. by Defendants Alaska Air Group, Inc. and Alaska Airlines, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/6/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grace et al v. Alaska Air Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Grace
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine R. Arcell
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Dean Bradt
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Bray
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Brito
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Marie Brown
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Conway
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Crandall
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary D'Augusta
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda K. Davis
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Faust
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Fjord
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Freeland
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Fry
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Garavanian
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Garavanian
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee M. Gentry
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valarie Ann Jolly
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail S. Kosach
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lovell
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C. Malaney
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Len Marazzo
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa McCarthy
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Meeuwsen
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. West Oehmig, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Prosterman
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah M. Pulfer
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana L. Robinson
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Rosenthal
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Rubinsohn
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sondra K. Russell
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia N. Sparks
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Stansbury
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde D. Stensrud
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Taleff
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Talewsky
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette M. Tippetts
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Lynn Ultican
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Michael Walker
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela S. Ward
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Farrah
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Air Group, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw
Represented By: Kenneth Ryan O'Rourke
Represented By: Richard George Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Airlines, Inc
Represented By: Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw
Represented By: Kenneth Ryan O'Rourke
Represented By: Richard George Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?