Haralson v. U.S. Aviation Services Corp. et al

Plaintiff: James Haralson
Defendant: U.S. Aviation Services Corp. and United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv05207
Filed: September 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 70 Continuing The Parties' Deadline To File Motion For Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement filed by U.S. Aviation Services Corp. Motion due by 1/9/2019. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 3, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 55 Stipulation and Order, Class Certification Briefing Schedule filed by U.S. Aviation Services Corp. Motion due by 5/4/2018. Responses due by 7/3/2018. Replies due by 8/28/2018. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 23, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE THE DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by James Haralson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 14, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re CASE MANAGEMENT DATES AND DEADLINES filed by U.S. Aviation Services Corp. Deadline to complete mediation 3/5/2018. Class certification motion deadline 3/5/2018 Class certification opposition 5/4/2018. Class certification reply 6/29/2018. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 12, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Defendant United Airlines, Inc. without prejudice filed by James Haralson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 7, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER COMPELLING THE PRODUCTION OF A CLASS LIST filed by U.S. Aviation Services Corp. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 19, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Stipulated Protective Order filed by United Airlines, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haralson v. U.S. Aviation Services Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Aviation Services Corp.
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Braham
Represented By: Brendan Dolan
Represented By: Brittany A. Sachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Anderson Wahlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Haralson
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?