Dastime Group Limited et al v. Vartanyan

Petitioner: Konstantin Grigorishin and Dastime Group Limited
Respondent: Alexander Vartanyan
Case Number: 3:2016cv05274
Filed: September 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 5 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Petitioners shall file the documents at issue in the public record no earlier than January 24, 2017 and no later than February 3, 2017. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 6, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 21 Administrative Motion to Permit Filing or Shorten Time. This corrects and supersedes 23 the Court's previous Order. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 5, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 21 Administrative Motion to Permit Filing or Shorten Time. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
December 16, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 5 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Responsive declarations are due no later than January 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on December 16, 2016. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dastime Group Limited et al v. Vartanyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Konstantin Grigorishin
Represented By: Neil A. Goteiner
Represented By: Kelly M Matayoshi
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dastime Group Limited
Represented By: Neil A. Goteiner
Represented By: Kelly M Matayoshi
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alexander Vartanyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?