Daly v. Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. et al

Plaintiff: Julie Daly
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher & Co., Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC and Gallagher Benefit Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv05302
Filed: September 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 28 Stipulation Continuing Deadline to Complete Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
February 14, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 26 Stipulated Protective Order. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
December 21, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Close of Fact Discovery due by 10/20/2017; Designation of Experts due by 10/20/2017; Rebuttal Reports due by 12/15/2017; Close of Expert Discovery due by 1/12/2018; Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2018 03:00 PM; Jury Selection /Jury Trial (10-day) set for 2/26/2018 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/21/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
November 30, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 14, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Docket No. 16 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/14/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daly v. Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Daly
Represented By: Sean Desmond McHenry
Represented By: Aaron Paul Minnis
Represented By: Sonya Lisa Smallets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.
Represented By: Lisa Mireille Bowman
Represented By: Charles L. Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC
Represented By: Lisa Mireille Bowman
Represented By: Charles L. Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Benefit Services, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Mireille Bowman
Represented By: Charles L. Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?