Vigdor et al v. Super Lucky Casino, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dan Vigdor and Stephen Bradway
Defendant: Super Lucky Casino, Inc. and Nicholas Talarico
Case Number: 3:2016cv05326
Filed: September 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ON ADMINISTRATIVE ( 150 , 154 , 158 , 159 , 163 )MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (This order grants/denies in part docket nos. 150 , 158 , 163 and grants docket nos. 154 and 159 ). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 184 Stipulation Continuing Defendants' Deadline to File a Bill of Costs and Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Plaintiffs' Deadline to Oppose. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 178 Stipulation Continuing Defendants' Deadline to File a Bill of Costs and Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Plaintiffs' Deadline to Oppose. Motions due by 12/21/2018 and Responses due by 1/11/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 176 Stipulation. Motions due by 12/18/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS 114 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING PLAINTIFFS 116 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS ( 124 , 135 ) MOTIONS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE-REDACTED VERSION.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ON ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. (granting in part and denying in part docket nos. 80 , 92 , 112 , 115 , 122 , 126 , 130 and 133 and granting docket nos. 88 and 140 ). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 111 Motion to Relate Cases Re 18-cv-4873-LB. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 109 Administrative Motion to Enlarge Page Limit. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 104 Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Seventh Cause of Action for Breach of Fiduciary Duty re 1 Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 94 REQUEST TO EXTEND CASE DEADLINES: Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/29/2018; Dispositive Motion due by 8/17/2018; Responses due by 8/31/2018; Replies due by 9/7/2018; Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Motions due by 11/6/2018; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/27/2018 03:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor; and Jury Selection /Jury Trial set for 12/10/2018 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/25/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 78 Stipulation TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 76 Stipulation TO CONTINUE AMENDED PLEADING AND MEDIATION DEADLINES. Amended Pleadings due by 1/12/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 68 Stipulation. Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 63 Stipulation re CASE SCHEDULE. Second Amended Complaint by 8/8/2017; Close of Fact Discovery due by 1/30/2018; Designation of Experts due by 2/23/2018; Designation of Rebuttal Experts d ue by 3/23/2018; Close of Expert Discovery due by 4/18/2018; Dispositive Motion due by 5/18/2018; Responses due by 6/1/2018; Replies due by 6/8/2018; Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2018 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Motions in Limine due by 8/14/2018; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2018 03:00 PM; Jury Selection /Jury Trial set for 9/17/2018 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 58 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Second Amended Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 46 MOTION TO PARTIALLY LIFT DISCOVERY STAY.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ORDER GRANTING IN PART 29 MOTION TO DISMISS.Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2017; Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2017 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document Regarding Completion of ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 47 Stipulation to Extend Defendants Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs Motion to Lift PSLRA Stay and Plaintiffs Deadline to Reply. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 23 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, and to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Response to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, and to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Response. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vigdor et al v. Super Lucky Casino, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Vigdor
Represented By: Marc Russell Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bradway
Represented By: Marc Russell Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Lucky Casino, Inc.
Represented By: Benedict Y Hur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Talarico
Represented By: Benedict Y Hur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?