Abdul-Haqq v. Kaiser Emergency In San Leandro

Plaintiff: Jamilah Abdul-Haqq
Defendant: Kaiser Emergency In San Leandro
Case Number: 3:2016cv05454
Filed: September 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 39 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
May 1, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 05/01/2017. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
February 10, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 16 Motion to Dismiss and Dismissing Complaint with Leave to Amend.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
December 28, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 12 Motion to Intervene as Moot.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 27, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Service of 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Vacating January 4, 2017 Hearing. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/27/2016. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdul-Haqq v. Kaiser Emergency In San Leandro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamilah Abdul-Haqq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Emergency In San Leandro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?